Accounts and annual returns MOBEUS EQUITY PARTNERS SCHOLARSHIP PROGRAMME LTD

Charity number: 1184959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 21 November 2024 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 06 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 September 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 September 2022 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 March 2022 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 March 2022 234 days late Download Open in new window