JUST ROW GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Just Row Gloucestershire has been setup to promote and encourage rowing at Gloucester Boathouse for those in the community who might be described as disadvantaged in some way. This includes those with physical, mental, financial and social barriers of all ages. We aim to fill that gap and in some cases provide a gateway into mainstream rowing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
INDIAJANE COX | Chair | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lee Morris | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ben Gallagher | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Dogherty | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Earl | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Helen Hicks | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Widden | Trustee | 17 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.34k | £15.19k | £33.27k | £8.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.30k | £14.92k | £11.96k | £8.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 283 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2022 | 283 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT AND COACHING IN ROWING
Contact information
- Address:
-
132 London Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 6HJ
- Phone:
- 07753384926
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window