BEYOND POSSIBLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Africa
Governance
- 28 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LANA STEVENSON | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Leigh Corden | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Stevenson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLEN DAVID HUDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 911 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1276 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE OR PREVENT THE POVERTY OF ABANDONED AND ORPHANED CHILDREN IN DURBAN, SOUTH AFRICA BY PROVIDING FUNDING AND EDUCATIONAL SERVICES TO CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OF THESE ORPHANED AND ABANDONED CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST FIELD
MAIDSTONE ROAD
MARDEN
TONBRIDGE
TN12 9AE
- Phone:
- 01622832035
- Email:
- stevenson.david@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window