CAPPELLA NOVOCASTRIENSIS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cappella Newcastle (founded in 1960 as Cappella Novocastriensis), specialises in singing music for worship and often sings unaccompanied. Cappella sings in churches throughout the North East, as well as giving several major concerts each year. The repertoire is varied and ambitious, ranging from English renaissance composers to contemporary works by Whitacre and Jackson.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 08 August 1983: Standard registration
- 07 October 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 January 2010: Standard registration
- Cappella Newcastle (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LAWRANCE | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Alma Klenka | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cherrylyn Dawn Summers | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kim Bartlett | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Beckman | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Anderson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN Bartlett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.42k | £5.51k | £10.18k | £13.56k | £15.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.16k | £5.45k | £11.15k | £11.11k | £18.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/1960 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/1961 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/1969 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1983 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/1987 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/1995 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 26/02/2014 as amended on 24 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 GOLDSPINK LANE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1NR
- Phone:
- 0191 261 8061
- Email:
- capnov@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window