RAINBOW FOUNDATION SUNDERLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation provides services throughout the year for the benefit of the LGBTQ community in the region, as well as providing regional events, and training to progress equality and diversity within the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Total income includes £6,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 27 September 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASH JOHNS MR | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JACK WILSON MR | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 290 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 290 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 656 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 656 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1021 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1021 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUNDERLAND AND THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND BY: (A) WORKING FOR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pride Media Centre
Stonehills (Unit T1)
Gateshead
Tyne and Wear
NE10 0HW
- Phone:
- 01915105022
- Website:
-
Rainbow-foundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window