HOLBEACH AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 514166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROVIDE A BUILDING FOR THE USE BY ALL PERSONS IN THE HOLBEACH DISTRICT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION FOR ALL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL, SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £22,873
Total expenditure: £22,405

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 August 1983: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOLBEACH COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN WARD Chair 21 April 2008
None on record
David Cooper Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
JACK LILLEY Trustee 29 April 2019
None on record
SUSAN WELBURN Trustee 24 April 2017
None on record
MISS LIZZY COWARD Trustee 12 March 2007
None on record
FRANCIS BIGGADIKE Trustee 20 March 2003
None on record
CHERYL M GRATTON Trustee 20 March 2003
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.10k £27.20k £22.67k £24.89k £22.87k
Total expenditure £17.72k £13.95k £19.31k £23.94k £22.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.34k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 FAIRFIELDS
HOLBEACH
SPALDING
PE12 7JE
Phone:
01406426080
Website:

No information available