WOMBOURNE VOLUNTEER BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOMBOURNE & NEARBY. DROP-IN CENTRE:INDIVIDUALS & GROUP TRANSPORT: LOANS OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, E.G. WHEELCHAIRS : DAY CARE 4 DAYS LUNCH CLUB: STROKE CLUB:ARTS & CRAFTS CLUB.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 August 1983: Standard registration
- THE HAND-IN-HAND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOROTHY JOAN SMITH | Chair | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA HELEN FIELDHOUSE | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HAYDEN MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANN MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK ERNEST MARSH | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE KATHLEEN LANAWAY | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL THOMAS FIELDHOUSE | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.48k | £16.87k | £7.28k | £16.96k | £24.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.41k | £14.10k | £14.19k | £26.31k | £22.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JULY 1983
Charitable objects
TO UNDETAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN SOCIAL SERVICES EDUCATION AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONG THOSE CLASSES IN NEED THEREOF RESIDENT IN WOMBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
WOMBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAND IN HAND CENTRE
CHURCH ROAD
WOMBOURNE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV5 9EZ
- Phone:
- 01902892492
- Email:
- wombournebureau@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window