Trustees IGNITE HUBS

Charity number: 1186658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Garry Taylor Trustee 14 April 2025
None on record
Thomas Robert Kenyon Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Graham Paul Bowles Trustee 15 February 2025
None on record
Zachary Boulden Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Christopher Siu Kwon Fung Trustee 02 January 2025
None on record
Themba Sweet Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Duncan Forbes Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record