OUNDLE & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and, in particular , the education of older people and those who are retired from full time work by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in the area of benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 June 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILLIAN MARY POTTS | Chair | 11 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Patricia Henshilwood | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Fenton | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Rose Traynor | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jane Hayward | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Kathryn Bett | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lidia Anna Douglas | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Susan Phillips | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Jean Ding | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.04k | £12.95k | £12.95k | £21.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.36k | £12.16k | £12.16k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 02 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 OCT 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Creed Road
Oundle
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4QN
- Phone:
- 01832 275933
- Email:
- oundleu3achairman@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window