CREATE4MENTALHEALTH

Charity number: 1186973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To assist in the treatment, care and rehabilitation of young people suffering from mental health issues. This will be achieved by raising awareness of mental health issues through social media platforms, and providing helpful information and content to the group's followers. The information and content will include video messages, short films, positive mental health messages.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £436
Total expenditure: £306

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CREATE4MH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Justin Howard Chair 09 May 2019
None on record
Grant Davison Trustee 10 May 2019
None on record
Liz Trayhorn Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
George Featherby Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record
Selina Welter Trustee 09 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.16k £60 £0 £436
Total expenditure £4.76k £26 £0 £306
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 03 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 03 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70 Sopwith House
Sigrist Square
Kingston upon Thames
Phone:
07906136715