THE MONEY MACRO AND FINANCE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the fields of monetary economics, macroeconomics, and financial economics in particular, but not exclusively within the United Kingdom through conferences, public lectures, publications, seminars, workshops and promoting research for the public benefit in all aspects of monetary economics, macroeconomics, and financial economics and publishing the useful results.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Miguel Angel Leon-Ledesma | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Claudia Girardone | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jagjit Singh Chadha | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Holly Prof | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL DAVID MIZEN | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Peter Nigel Smith | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon Glover Price | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Fatmah Gulcin Ozkan | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Coroneo | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.10k | £13.88k | £38.20k | £47.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.92k | £13.33k | £34.23k | £35.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF MONETARY ECONOMICS, MACROECONOMICS, AND FINANCIAL ECONOMICS IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH CONFERENCES, PUBLIC LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS AND PROMOTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF MONETARY ECONOMICS, MACROECONOMICS, AND FINANCIAL ECONOMICS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
University Of York
Dep. of Economics
Heslington
YORK
YO10 5DD
- Phone:
- 01159515479
- Email:
- secretary@mmf.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window