LOUGHBOROUGH STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Details of the policies, objectives and activities of Loughborough Students Union are outlined in the Trustees Report included in the year end Financial Statements. These statements are uploaded as a PDF to the charity Commission website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£8,250,610
Donations and legacies | £1.53m | |
Charitable activities | £606.04k | |
Other trading activities | £6.09m | |
Investments | £30.35k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,645,089
Raising funds | £4.79m | |
Charitable activities | £3.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.85m |
People

326 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
1102 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Newham
Governance
- 29 May 2019: Standard registration
- 12 July 2021: Funds received from 1146696 LOUGHBOROUGH STUDENTS' UNION
- LSU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Della Freeth | Chair | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Alvey | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Atlas Alberich | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamshid Tavallali | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Franceca Suckling | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Smith | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Simpson | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Peat | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Moseley | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Otter | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mia Jackson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Moronfolu | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colina Wright | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma-Louise Victoria Kilby-Brooks | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.75m | £6.51m | £9.15m | £8.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.41m | £6.68m | £8.75m | £8.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £752.00k | £1.00m | £81.24k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.34m | £2.66m | £1.78m | £1.53m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.15m | £2.88m | £0 | £6.09m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.25m | £626.83k | £1.38m | £606.04k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.21k | £19 | £287 | £30.35k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £332.02k | £5.99m | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.34m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.18m | £3.61m | £4.42m | £3.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.23m | £3.07m | £4.32m | £4.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.00k | £0 | £32.75k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.96m | £3.55m | £98.60k | £118.07k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £20.00k | £20.00k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.28m | £1.13m | £4.77m | £5.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£4.72m | -£4.58m | -£3.86m | -£4.05m | |
|
Total liabilities | £625.68k | £1.62m | £1.47m | £1.98m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAY 2019 as amended on 18 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE UNION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. ENRICHING AND ENHANCING THE EDUCATIONAL EXPERIENCE OF ITS MEMBERS AS PEOPLE AS WELL AS INTELLECTUALS; 2. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS TO DEVELOP THEIR PERSONAL MATURITY, LEADERSHIP, AND COMMUNICATION AND OTHER SKILLS; 3. ACTING AS THE PRINCIPAL BODY REPRESENTING ITS MEMBERS' VIEWS AND INTERESTS WITHIN THEIR INSTITUTION, TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND NATIONALLY; 4. ENHANCING THE STUDENT COMMUNITY AND STUDENT WELLBEING BY PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE; 5. ENSURING THAT STUDENTS EXPERIENCING PROBLEMS WITH STUDENT LIFE CAN GET THE SUPPORT AND HELP THEY NEED, AND SEEKING TO MINIMISE THE LIKELIHOOD OF THE PROBLEMS OCCURRING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loughborough Students Union
Ashby Road
Loughborough
LE11 3TT
- Phone:
- 01509363180
- Email:
- suelucas@lsu.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window