Living Temple Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 September 2019: CIO registration
- HOUSE OF INSPIRATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Conteh DC | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mercy Akinfolarin | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Conteh | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
SOLAPE ABIODUN ALATISE | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.32k | £70.66k | £51.11k | £47.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.10k | £36.22k | £31.48k | £43.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Sep 2019 as amended on 18 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
214 Old Road East
GRAVESEND
Kent
DA12 1PQ
- Phone:
- 07415120274
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window