Financial history THE OPEN UNIVERSITY STUDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1183837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.11m £2.11m £2.17m £2.28m £2.38m
Total expenditure £1.51m £1.61m £2.89m £1.72m £2.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.92m £1.96m £1.99m £2.10m £2.14m
Income - Other trading activities £78.33k £69.12k £79.45k £79.67k £88.16k
Income - Charitable activities £110.55k £77.68k £100.76k £74.52k £74.66k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.25k £162 £921 £29.96k £73.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £3.62k £1.85k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.43m £1.55m £2.82m £1.64m £2.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £81.00k £61.87k £68.60k £78.08k £72.97k
Expenditure - Governance £31.08k £22.42k £22.74k £24.67k £26.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.85k £2.55k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0