Financial history PURPLE HOUSE NURSERIES

Charity Number: 1184254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £67.79k £89.65k £67.61k £79.49k £79.33k
Total expenditure £57.13k £83.35k £93.08k £65.74k £94.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A