MEN IN SHEDS (GOOLE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Men in Sheds (Goole) is for the benefit, the preservation and protection of good health among men 18 years and older (including retired, unemployed or in ill-health) living in Goole and the surrounding area, through the provision of facilities for hobbies, recreation or ther leisure time activities including practical interests, skills sharing and help with community based projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Glynn Burndred | Chair | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Walter William Graham | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sid Gilroy-Simpson | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALF DEAKINS | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Murray | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.87k | £29.39k | £5.07k | £3.51k | £5.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.86k | £4.69k | £10.93k | £6.56k | £6.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 April 2025 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2023 | 358 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG MEN AGED 18 YEARS AND OLDER, LIVING IN GOOLE AND SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HOBBIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS, SKILLS SHARING, THE LEARNING OF SKILLS, AND HELPING WITH COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Men in Sheds
Old Bowling Club
Bartholomew Avenue
Goole
East Riding of Yorkshire
DN14 6YN
- Phone:
- 07394521970
- Email:
- menshedsgoole@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window