WILMINGTON COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity Number: 1183656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of Wilmington Community Church CIO is to promote the Christian faith in the area of Wilmington Kent and surrounding areas and using video technology reach world wide. It is also our purpose to to provide social support in the local area including supporting the vulnerable, befriending and some domestic help and through our counselling centre offer counselling services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £162,947
Total expenditure: £171,159

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • WILMINGTON CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Thomas Mann Chair 01 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Peter Birmingham Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Amma Frimpong-Manso Trustee 19 February 2023
GLAMSCI
Received: On time
KAREN MARIE MORRISSEY Trustee 15 December 2021
None on record
Gordon Paul Raggett Trustee 19 May 2019
OASIS COUNSELLING SERVICES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £129.97k £134.73k £150.41k £152.33k £162.95k
Total expenditure £59.63k £132.51k £145.86k £137.45k £171.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 February 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 February 2022 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 February 2021 7 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wilmington Community Church
Broad Lane
DARTFORD
DA2 7AQ
Phone:
01322278501