THE CASTLE EDEN METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

26 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 08 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Beverly Hollings | Chair | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane G Coleman BA | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Harris BSc | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janice Adele Long | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Ann Coleman | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Turton | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Bosworth | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Bonner | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Percival MA Cert Ed | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Parker Cert Ed | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Massey MA,BA,PGCE | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Colin Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elaine Bramfitt | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Margaret Murray | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Massey | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrew Henderson | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ELIZABETH WINN | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH WEATHERSPOON | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Evelyn Talbot | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lyons | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Cammock | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|||||
Alison Ogle | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|||||
Craig Anthony Long | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Caswell | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
Joan Mary Rennie | Trustee | 01 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.39k | £507.93k | £466.83k | £185.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.35k | £532.95k | £173.38k | £203.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £92.27k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £20.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £2.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £393.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £532.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £6.22k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Circuit Office
22 Tremaine Close
Hartlepool
Cleveland
TS27 3LE
- Phone:
- 07768983718
- Email:
- castleedenmeth@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window