MEN IN SHEDS BEVERLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For public benefit, the prevention and protection of good health among men aged 18 years and older, living in Beverley and the surrounding area, including those who are retired, unemployed or have health problems, through the provision of facilities for hobbies, recreation or other leisure time occupations including practical interests, skills sharing, the learning of new skills, and helping wi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
Total income includes £3,174 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 July 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Andrew Ellett | Chair | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Arthur John Harbach | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Kyle | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wilkin | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Sutton | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin George Sheehan | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Oldroyd | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2020 | 01/07/2021 | 01/07/2022 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.17k | £9.84k | £9.39k | £6.80k | £11.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £9.00k | £6.98k | £11.11k | £10.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.84k | N/A | N/A | £3.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2021 | 18 October 2022 | 170 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG MEN AGED 18 YEARS AND OLDER, LIVING IN BEVERLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, INCLUDING THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED, UNEMPLOYED OR HAVE HEALTH PROBLEMS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR HOBBIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS INCLUDING PRACTICAL INTERESTS, SKILLS SHARING, THE LEARNING OF NEW SKILLS, AND HELPING WITH COMMUNITY BASED PROJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODMANSEY GARDEN CENTRE
HULL ROAD
WOODMANSEY
BEVERLEY
HU17 0RS
- Phone:
- 07795820443
- Email:
- BeverleyMIS@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window