CARING HEART MADAGASCAR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of Caring Heart Madagascar is to help those in poverty in Tamatave, Madagascar. We operate 2 feeding programs to help reduce/ prevent malnutrition, one in the city centre and one in the local prison. Both of these feeding programs run 6 days a week. We also sponsor children to go to school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Madagascar
Governance
- 04 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Seth Schaben | Chair | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marla Schaben | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Schaben | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £24.05k | £12.26k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.43k | £24.05k | £12.26k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN MADAGASCAR BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whistledown
Station Road
YELVERTON
Devon
PL20 6HX
- Phone:
- 07864373673
- Website:
-
Caringheartmadagascar.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window