THE NEW EARSWICK LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold public meetings and events for members and interested persons about the history of the village of New Earswick. Promote and conduct and publicise research into the Village's history Add to and strengthen the Village's cultural life Liaise and work with other similar organisations, particularly those connected with Joseph Rowntree's heritage, to further promote the Charity's Objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 November 2019: CIO registration
- 02 April 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
- 02 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1105936 THE ROWNTREE SOCIETY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £505 | £1.01k | £560 | |
|
Total expenditure | £45 | £120 | £556 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Nov 2019 as amended on 22 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF NEW EARSWICK AND THE LOCAL AREA, BY PROVIDING A FORUM FOR LOCALS TO EXCHANGE IDEAS AND INFORMATION AND WORK COLLABORATIVELY ON PROJECTS THAT PROMOTE THE HISTORY OF THE VILLAGE TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY OF THE AREA IN GENERAL. (2) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF NEW EARSWICK AND THE LOCAL AREA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window