Accounts and annual returns MAYOR OF FELIXSTOWE CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1184138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 19 March 2025 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 19 March 2025 353 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 01 June 2023 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 04 June 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required