LGBT CHARITY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a non-profit charity, We provide support to LGBT projects. We also work with other organisations that wish to challenge anti-gay laws with in and outside the United Kingdom. We will leave our doors open to offer advice, support and information to lesbian, gay, bisexual and transgender within and outside our community.also help homeless and give out food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 2019: CIO registration
- LGBTQ+ Charity uk (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Hill | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Conway | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Mallett | Trustee | 03 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Conway | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/05/2021 | 12/05/2022 | 12/05/2023 | 12/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.00k | £109.87k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.00k | £114.12k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 May 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 May 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 May 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 May 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY OF THOSE THROUGHOUT ENGLAND IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FUNDING AND OR GRANTS TO CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHO ARE CONCERNED WITH THE ISSUES AND DIFFICULTIES AFFECTING THE LIVES OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER (LGBT) PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LGBT CHARITY
100 Talbot Road
BLACKPOOL
FY1 1LR
- Phone:
- 0300 102 1629
- Email:
- luke@lgbtcharity.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window