WHARFEDALE MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Shed is about having fun, sharing skills and knowledge with like-minded people and gaining a sense of purpose and belonging, by working on projects for ourselves & the community. Work undertaken by our members includes making various Planters, Bird Tables & Boxes & Hedgehog homes in addition to carrying out repairs to a number of pieces of furniture and toys for members of the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 29 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Emblin | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mark Burnett | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert O'Brien | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Stuart Gregory | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Henry Miles | Trustee | 29 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.55k | £2.52k | £4.69k | £4.44k | £6.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £1.51k | £4.82k | £4.35k | £7.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 01 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 May 2020
(These accounts |
22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEN AGED 18 OR OVER, WITHIN WHARFEDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE, AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); OR CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wharfedale Men's Shed
C/O Otley Courthouse
Courthouse Street
OTLEY
LS21 3AN
- Phone:
- 07886093221
- Email:
- wharfedalemensshed@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window