HARLEQUIN CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harlequin Care offers complementary therapies , counselling and befriending to Dorset's unpaid Carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 13 January 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Elizabeth Wayman | Chair | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARRY BRISTOW | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Sybil Franklin | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £2.14k | £14.88k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £513 | £5.02k | £10.17k | £9.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY THE PROVISION OF SHORT TERM REST AND RECUPERATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Colletts Close
Corfe Castle
WAREHAM
BH20 5HG
- Phone:
- 07547136041
- Email:
- info@harlequincare.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window