HOPE IN BIRMINGHAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a charity we provide an outreach service to rough sleepers and those vulnerably housed in Birmingham. We meet crisis situations by offering food, drinks and clothes. We engage and signpost to statutory and charity organisations to move individuals forward supporting them into accommodation or other support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 October 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 31 May 2019: CIO registration
- 12 May 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 12 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1080154 ST BASIL'S
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/10/2020 | 20/10/2021 | 20/10/2022 | 20/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.08k | £2.87k | £2.63k | £813 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.59k | £1.47k | £1.91k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 20 October 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2022 | 26 August 2023 | 6 days late | |
Annual return | 20 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2021 | 28 August 2022 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 20 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 October 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR ROUGH SLEEPERS IN BIRMINGHAM BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, BEDDING, FOOD AND DRINKS AND TOILETRIES AND BY HELPING THEM TO ACCESS ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER SERVICES THOUGH SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER AGENCIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS APPROPRIATE AND SUPPORTING HOMELESS PEOPLE WHO HAVE RECENTLY MOVED FROM THE STREETS INTO ACCOMMODATION BY THE PROVISION OF ESSENTIAL ITEMS AS SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window