KOINONIA EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1193095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the Christian Gospel and practical work in the community youth and the disadvantaged. Support of overseas mission work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £132,706
Total expenditure: £78,536

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2021: CIO registration
  • 09 November 2021: Funds received from 1077730 KOINONIA INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL CHURCH
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen James Wicks Chair 01 September 2023
None on record
Timothy Matthew Coles Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
HILARY ANN RUSHWORTH Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
GRAMANI BASIL JACOBS Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £66.46k £85.97k £132.71k
Total expenditure £43.64k £60.07k £78.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Larches
Clatford Lodge
Anna Valley
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP11 7DL
Phone:
07743806878