Financial history THE JANE LEMON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1183791
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/06/2020 06/06/2021 06/06/2022 06/06/2023 06/06/2024
Total gross income £62.40k £49.38k £52.06k £77.86k £95.34k
Total expenditure £2.76k £1.42k £11.09k £80.77k £72.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A