KINGDOM EMPOWERMENT MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL FELLOWSHIP (KEMIF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian religion mainly, but not exclusively, by means of broadcasting Christian messages of an evangelistic and teaching nature, through the holding of Christian religious worship, prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals, producing and/or distributing literature on Christian religion to enlighten others about the Christian religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Elizabeth Ibidapo | Chair | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Gabriel Phioenix | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Calvin Kudzai Mutunzi | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harry Adeniyi Ibidapo | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.04k | £15.17k | £8.97k | £10.79k | £76.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.22k | £12.39k | £12.89k | £10.34k | £77.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS WORSHIP, PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIAN RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3.ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON STABLE AND HEALTHY RELATIONSHIPS, INCLUDING PROMOTING THE CAPABILITY OF INDIVIDUALS TO FORM AND SUSTAIN STABLE AND HEALTHY RELATIONSHIPS AS WELL AS EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO RELATIONSHIPS AND MATTERS CONNECTED WITH FAMILY LIFE. 4.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITHIN THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND BY INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM G09
RAM MILL BUSINESS CENTER
GORDON STREET
CHADDERTON
MANCHESTER
MANCHEST
- Phone:
- 07506780665
- Email:
- pastors.kemif@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window