GILLINGHAM STREET ANGELS

Charity number: 1184311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support people living in Medway affected by homelessness, financial hardship & food poverty. We deliver our support holistically through free foodbanks, community soup kitchens & school uniform banks on top of a wide range of other food initiatives & services. We have charity stores, recycling programmes, inclusive volunteering schemes and a selection of other free health & wellbeing services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent
  • Medway

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2019: CIO registration
  • 14 December 2021: Funds received from 1183966 STROOD COMMUNITY CENTRE
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE STREET ANGELS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Henderson Chair 11 March 2025
None on record
Janette Timms Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Kaz Macklin Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
Angela Yates Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
ISITOA CHUKWUMA UWAECHIA Trustee 05 November 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £118.11k £222.79k £666.29k £1.23m
Total expenditure £90.23k £191.81k £474.72k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.51k £120.37k £305.65k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £85.57k £401.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £304.71k £829.45k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £276.01k £351
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £404.56k £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £3.31k £2.50k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £66.85k £1.12m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets N/A N/A £77.74k £112.43k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £261.25k £245.11k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 Skinner Street
Gillingham
Medway
Kent
ME7 1LG
Phone:
07437 657 982