SPLATS N SPLODGES OSC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Splats N Splodges is an wrap around childcare provider based at Elton School,Peterborough PE8 6RS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £13,667 from 5 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 12 June 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rui Gonzaga | Chair | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jones | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Williams | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gobbi | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 311 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 677 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1042 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF ELTON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OUT OF SCHOOL CARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elton C of E Primary School
School Lane
Elton
Peterborough
PE8 6RS
- Phone:
- 01832280314
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window