Financial history OPERA WORCESTER

Charity number: 1183967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.30k £2.87k £9.39k £14.17k £17.08k
Total expenditure £5.34k £651 £13.19k £13.94k £16.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500