INTERNATIONAL MUSIC IN PERFORMANCE AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Then purpose of IMPEF is to promote, improve, develop and foster the appreciation, understanding and education of the art and science of music from any era and in all its aspects, including but not limited to the presentation - independently or collaboratively - of: public concerts; music competitions and other music connected presentations as well as learning opportunities of people of all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 October 2019: CIO registration
- THE INTERNATIONAL INTERVIEW CONCERTS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Chick | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Amey | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Olga Paliy M.A. | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/05/2020 | 22/05/2021 | 22/05/2022 | 22/05/2023 | 22/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.24k | £659 | £27 | £1.52k | £2.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £513 | £1.02k | £0 | £794 | £1.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 May 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 May 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 22 May 2020 | 03 April 2022 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 May 2020 | 03 April 2022 | 377 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND FOSTER THE APPRECIATION, UNDERSTANDING AND EDUCATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC FROM ANY ERA AND IN ALL ITS ASPECTS, INCLUDING: 1. THE PRESENTATION, INDEPENDENTLY OR COLLABORATIVELY WITH OTHERS, OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, MUSIC COMPETITIONS AND OTHER VARIOUS MUSIC AND MUSIC-CONNECTED PRESENTATIONS, ON ANY SCALE; 2. THE PROVISION OF LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, CONFERENCES, EXHIBITIONS, MASTERCLASSES, LECTURES AND OTHER SUCH ACTIVITIES; AND 3. THE FOSTERING OF THE MUSIC AND CAREER DEVELOPMENT OF TOMORROWÆS MUSICAL PERFORMERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 GUILDFORD ROAD
WORTHING
30 Guildford Road
WORTHING
BN14 7LL
- Phone:
- 01903 236733
- Email:
- interviewconcerts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window