IVO DAY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The centre is run by a management committee with the purpose to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Spalding and the surrounding area without distraction of political, religious or other opinions, by the advancement of education and the provision of facilities for social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving conditions of life for thesaid inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 01 September 1983: Standard registration
- IVO RESOURCE AND DAY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mick Pell | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sue Croucher | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Corrina Prew | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HENRY BESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.06k | £5.41k | £1.72k | £8.75k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.62k | £6.09k | £788 | £13.49k | £7.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
A MULTI PURPOSE DAY CENTRE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SPALDING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SPALDING AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
67A ALBION STREET
SPALDING
PE11 2AU
- Phone:
- 01775768888
- Email:
- IVODAYCENTRE@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window