Financial history BAKER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1184392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £45.00k £2.00k £0 £270.36k £288.31k
Total expenditure £31.46k £672 £8.02k £229.31k £695.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A