THE NEW NORMAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The New Normal provides safe spaces for young adults suffering with life's difficult moments to discuss the issues they are facing through the provision of peer to peer group support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cassandra Geisel | Chair | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Folake Fowowe | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kennedy-Fallon | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Okell | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Julian May | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Atkinson | Trustee | 22 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £43.60k | £45.45k | £105.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £917 | £17.39k | £42.85k | £87.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jan 2020 as amended on 02 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY BEREAVEMENT, LOSS AND OTHER CIRCUMSTANCES ARISING FROM GRIEF THAT MAY IMPACT THEIR MENTAL HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND GROUP SUPPORT SESSIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Hornsey Rise Gardens
LONDON
N19 3PP
- Phone:
- 07809693527
- Email:
- info@thenewnormalcharity.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window