Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LITTLE HEARTS AND SACRED HEART (BYERMOOR)

Charity number: 1183527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 October 2021 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 December 2021 184 days late Download Open in new window