LEEDS POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL CLUB (LPFC)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LPFC provides powerchair football opportunities for people with a disability. The club provides weekly coaching sessions and playing opportunities across a range of local, regional and national leagues. Based in Leeds the club is able to offer powerchair football for people right across the county. All coaches are FA qualified and all staff are DBS Certified. No one is ever turned away!
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 July 2019: Standard registration
- LEEDS PFC (Working name)
- LEEDS POWERCHAIR FC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Maxwell | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Harris | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Watson | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Copeland | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BRITTON | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GORMAN | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.33k | £11.47k | £64.05k | £27.23k | £30.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.05k | £21.21k | £33.23k | £54.49k | £25.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PERSONS BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES TO PLAY POWERCHAIR FOOTBALL FOR ENJOYMENT AND COMPETITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LADYWOOD GRANGE
LEEDS
LS8 2LU
- Phone:
- 07702254506
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window