KIDDERMINSTER AND DISTRICT YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kidderminster & District Youth Trust provide a safe, secure, fun environment where young people get support in identifying their strengths & skills, so they can avoid, or be better able to deal with challenges in their lives. We help them to increase opportunities, have their voices heard & realise their full potential in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £197,004 from 3 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 02 August 2019: CIO registration
- KDYT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Anthony Denslow | Chair | 02 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Marsha Georgina White | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Thomas Johnston | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHARINE HOPE | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Finnemore | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Oborski MBE | Trustee | 02 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Picken QPM | Trustee | 02 August 2019 |
|
|||||
David Verry Adam JP | Trustee | 02 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.59k | £252.96k | £335.85k | £365.36k | £339.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.54k | £216.45k | £237.09k | £319.19k | £329.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.56k | £62.62k | N/A | £166.06k | £197.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £77.45k | £116.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE THE ‘AREA OF BENEFIT’ IS DEFINED AS THE TOWNS OF KIDDERMINSTER, BEWDLEY AND STOURPORT-ON-SEVERN AND THE RURAL AREA OF WYRE FOREST DISTRICT COUNCIL TOGETHER WITH ANY OTHER AREAS OF WORCESTERSHIRE OR NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES WHICH THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Youth House
Bromsgrove Street
Kidderminster
DY10 1PF
- Phone:
- 01562228113
- Email:
- info@kdyt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window