UNIQUE KNOWLEDGE SEEKERS ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit by providing a full-time, Ofsted registered, Independent school for children to advance knowledge, understanding, and skills in National Curriculum subjects as well as Islamic curriculum subjects. We also operate a supplementary school providing after school, weekend and holiday activities. PLEASE NOTE WE DO RAISE FUNDS FROM THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £141,344 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hounslow
Governance
- 02 August 2019: CIO registration
- Unique Academy (Working name)
- Unique Madrasah & Tuition Academy (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hawwa Mbombo | Chair | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adnan Haq | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Nooruddeen Uthmaan Hamani | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.72k | £65.85k | £255.48k | £248.63k | £363.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.99k | £67.54k | £235.76k | £250.09k | £354.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £73.91k | £103.60k | £141.34k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Aug 2019 as amended on 07 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
To advance education for the public benefit by providing a full-time, Ofsted registered, Independent school for children to advance knowledge, understanding, and skills in National Curriculum subjects as well as Islamic curriculum subjects
Contact information
- Address:
-
Khosla House
Park Lane
Cranford
HOUNSLOW
TW5 9WA
- Phone:
- 02080045481
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window