SOUTHAMPTON LIGHTHOUSE INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are to 1) Advance the Christian faith for the public benefit, particularly amongst the international community in Southampton. 2) To maintain a church for the advancement of the Christian religion in Southampton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southampton City
Governance
- 25 July 2019: CIO registration
- 09 June 2021: Funds received from 290183 SOUTHAMPTON LIGHTHOUSE INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (SLIC)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melroy Dsouza | Chair | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kearns | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Bartlett | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ladher | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH SYMONS | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £405.89k | £152.83k | £172.34k | £153.64k | £161.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £469.14k | £113.22k | £105.16k | £130.12k | £164.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO 1) ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY IN SOUTHAMPTON. 2) TO MAINTAIN A CHURCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SOUTHAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lighthouse
St MaryÆs Road
Southampton
- Phone:
- 02380226004
- Email:
- Office@slic.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window