BRITISH FASHION COUNCIL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty Arts/culture/heritage/science Economic/community Development/employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,852,899
Donations and legacies | £1.67m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £183.11k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,263,482
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.26m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.26m | |
Retained for future use | £589.42k |
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Weir | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andin Fonyonga | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Pemsel | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pam Batty | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Davidson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE RUSH | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15m | £4.95m | £1.92m | £1.32m | £1.85m | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £1.43m | £938.69k | £1.08m | £1.26m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.15m | £4.95m | £1.92m | £1.29m | £1.67m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £112 | £1.59k | £470 | £35.90k | £183.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.87m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £0 | £1.43m | £938.69k | £1.08m | £1.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £774 | £0 | £2.97k | £570 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £938.65k | £990.00k | £1.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £25 | £3.65k | £0 | £50 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.38m | £4.79m | £5.72m | £5.95m | £6.82m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £227.89k | £124.93k | £69.08k | £58.54k | £339.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 June 2021 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 APR 2019 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC - (1) THE PROMOTION OF THE ART OF FASHION DESIGN IN CLOTHING AND RELATED ACCESSORIES (FOR CONVENIENCE REFERRED TO AS ‘CLOTHING’) AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THAT ART IN PARTICULAR BY - (A) FOSTERING AND PROMOTING CONTEMPORARY CLOTHING FASHION DESIGN OF MERIT THROUGH THE CONDUCT OF COMPETITIONS AND THE GIVING OF AWARDS OR PRIZES TO THOSE SUCCESSFUL IN THEM; (B) PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, PRIZES AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO) STUDENTS OF CLOTHING FASHION DESIGN; (C) ESTABLISHING, AND PROMOTING THE CREATION OF, APPRENTICESHIPS IN CLOTHING FASHION DESIGN; (D) PROMOTING, ORGANISING, HOLDING AND UNDERTAKING FASHION SHOWS, EXHIBITIONS AND EVENTS AND IN PARTICULAR FASHION SHOWS AS PART OF THE FASHION CALENDAR, AND SECURING THE PARTICIPATION, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT OF OTHER FASHION SHOW EXHIBITION AND PROMOTIONAL ORGANISERS; (E) ENCOURAGING, HELPING, ASSISTING, PROMOTING AND UNDERTAKING BY WHATEVER MEANS, INCLUDING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF TRUSTS AND OTHER BODIES CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, THE EDUCATION, INSTRUCTION, TRAINING AND ESTABLISHMENT OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR MAY BE EMPLOYED IN THE BRITISH CLOTHING FASHION INDUSTRY AND IN PARTICULAR OF FASHION DESIGNERS; (F) PROMOTING, ORGANISING AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATION INTO ALL ASPECTS OF ANY MATTERS RELATED THE ART OF CLOTHING FASHION DESIGN, AND TO PUBLISH PAPERS, MATERIALS AND INFORMATION IN ANY FORM RESULTING FROM SUCH RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATIONS; (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CLOTHING FASHION INDUSTRY THROUGH THE IMPROVEMENT OF STANDARDS AND QUALITY OF PERFORMANCE WITHIN THE INDUSTRY IN PARTICULAR BY (A) PROMOTING SCHEMES FOR GIVING PUBLIC RECOGNITION TO PRODUCTS DISPLAYING HIGH STANDARDS OF CLOTHING FASHION DESIGN; (B) SUPPORTING INITIATIVES FOR SAFEGUARDING THE HEALTH OF CLOTHING FASHION MODELS; (C) RESEARCHING AND DEVELOPING SUSTAINABLE, EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE METHODS OF PRODUCTION AND SUPPLY, IN ORDER TO ACHIEVE ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION WITHIN THE CLOTHING FASHION INDUSTRY; (D) CREATING WITHIN THE CLOTHING FASHION INDUSTRY A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (E) PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR NEW VENTURES WITHIN THE CLOTHING FASHION INDUSTRY WHERE FOR FINANCIAL OR OTHER REASONS OF CHARITABLE NEED SUCH SUPPORT WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNAVAILABLE. (3) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE QUALIFIED TO WORK IN THE CLOTHING FASHION BUSINESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Soho Works,
180 The Strand,
LONDON
WC2R 1EA
- Phone:
- 02077591999
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window