CAUDA EQUINA CHAMPIONS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Strive to raise awareness of Cauda Equina Syndrome (CES) and support people living with the condition. The aim is to embrace people living with CES and by using our collective voice we hope we will bring about change and an end to unnecessary suffering. We hope to reduce the number of people suffering from CES and empower and support people to continue to live positive, happy lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Hannah Thornber | Chair | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Firas Sarhan | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
vanessa bewley-robinson | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.84k | £52.78k | £116.25k | £61.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.46k | £1.44k | £5.96k | £16.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 January 2025 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CAUDA EQUINA SYNDROME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY TO PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CAUDA EQUINA SYNDROME; (B) FURTHERING AND BUILDING AWARENESS, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN RESPECT OF CAUDA EQUINA SYNDROME AND ITS TREATMENT AND PREVENTION; AND (C) PROMOTING AND INFLUENCING EFFECTIVE CARE, INVOLVEMENT AND SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CAUDA EQUINA SYNDROME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor, Britannia House
The Sidings
Whalley
CLITHEROE
Lancashire
BB7 9SE
- Phone:
- 03335777113
- Email:
- info@championscharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window