THE VERINA BLACK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees are keen to support a wide range of areas that would have been of interest to the late Mrs Verina Black. In particular to support volunteer led projects that enhance rural life and promote local skills. The Trustees are keen to act on a matched funding basis wherever possible, but will consider stand alone funding where there is significant benefit for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 October 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Dettmer | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Dettmer | Trustee | 08 April 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/04/2020 | 08/04/2021 | 08/04/2022 | 08/04/2023 | 08/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.19k | £1.53m | £61.27k | £192.54k | £66.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.19k | £38.32k | £59.20k | £47.34k | £38.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.52m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £10.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £1.52m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £11.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £16.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £16.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £10.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 April 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 APR 2002
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MORNINGTON HOUSE
SPELTHAM HILL
HAMBLEDON
WATERLOOVILLE
PO7 4RU
- Phone:
- 02392632257
- Email:
- vbcharitabletrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window