LADY D'ARCY WITH FYNCHES AND BERRYFIELD COTTAGES ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of affordable housing in the form of almshouses for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 21 November 2019: CIO registration
- 06 May 2021: Funds received from 1104882 LADY D'ARCY WITH FYNCHES AND BERRYFIELD COTTAGES A...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Charles Dundas Irven | Chair | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Heslegrave | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Chumbley | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER HYWYN JONES | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Ann Reeves | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Gordon Humphreys | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Bareham | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Anthony Bloomfield | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.77k | £143.89k | £163.33k | £175.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.91k | £132.44k | £81.76k | £86.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 May 2022 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 May 2022 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
1.1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND 1.2. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fornham House
227 London Road
Stanway
COLCHESTER
CO3 8PB
- Phone:
- 07951355362
- Email:
- vcdepledge@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window