BE: TRANS SUPPORT AND COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Facilitated support and social spaces. Materials delivering advice & awareness around health and social care for trans people. Project work (local/national) to deliver the aims of the Charity. Local events to deliver awareness and education around issues of equality and diversity. Advice and consultation with organisations and services to directly benefit transgender people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 November 2019: CIO registration
- BE NORTH (Working name)
- BE TRANS SUPPORT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Marshall | Chair | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalina Furie | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Anderson | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Irwin | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Michelle Tysoe | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Dellbridge | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £3.62k | £3.10k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £690 | £749 | £2.97k | £1.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION IN RELATION TO TRANSGENDER PEOPLE IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) PROVIDING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR TRANSGENDER PEOPLE; B) PROMOTING EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RAISING AWARENESS IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF TRANSGENDER HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE NEEDS AND RELATED EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES WITH THE AIM OF ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION; C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Be Trans Support and Community
c/o Pride Action North
Adamson House
65 Westgate Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 1SG
- Phone:
- 07528784480
- Email:
- teambe@be-north.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window