Accounts and annual returns JUNCTION 7

Charity number: 1185423
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 April 2025 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 April 2025 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 April 2025 427 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 April 2025 427 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 February 2024 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 February 2024 385 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 March 2023 420 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 March 2023 420 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 March 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window