Financial history JUNCTION 7

Charity number: 1185423
Charity reporting is up to date (69 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.50k £85.40k £56.32k £111.05k £35.16k
Total expenditure £9.60k £59.31k £45.20k £109.55k £33.48k
Income from government contracts £500 N/A N/A £76.52k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £37.82k N/A £5.51k