THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS,KENLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The PCC is committed to enabling as many people as possible to worship at our church and to become part of the parish community. The PCC maintains an overview of worship and works with the incumbent to provide services that can involve the many groups of people that live in the parish. We provide activites within the community such as play sessions, craft mornings and film afternoons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
Governance
- 12 September 2019: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS KENLEY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justine Middlemass | Chair | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Rodwell | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sheila Dighton | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Charles Preston | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Darnelle Constant-Shepherd | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Kimberley | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Stanley Shepherd | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charmian Preston | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Stock | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Howe | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Bedwell | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Iris Jones | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE GOODRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.87k | £67.74k | £81.75k | £85.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.21k | £67.48k | £73.13k | £81.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church Road
Kenley
CR8 5DU
- Phone:
- 02086603251
- Email:
- office@saintb.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window