Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS,KENLEY
Charity number: 1185283

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Justine Middlemass | Chair | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arthur Rodwell | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sheila Dighton | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Charles Preston | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Darnelle Constant-Shepherd | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Kimberley | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Stanley Shepherd | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charmian Preston | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Stock | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Howe | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Bedwell | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Iris Jones | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE GOODRIDGE | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.